CA AB1939 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-29 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-29 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51210 and 51220 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: science requirements: climate change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1939 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | 6-23-2022 hearing rescheduled by committee to 6-22-2022. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 0. Page 4572.) |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 27). |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |