CA AB1906 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 325, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 325, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1660 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Voluntary stream restoration: property owner liability: indemnification: claims.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Assembly - AB 1906 Stone Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent AB1906 Stone By Laird Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1906 Stone Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent AB1906 Stone By Laird Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1906 Stone Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 325, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4977.). |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 4578.). |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and JUD. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 1660 | Amended Code | Citation Text |