CA AB1900 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 89, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 89, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 1748.50) to Title 1.3.5 of Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to consumer refunds.
Title
Consumer refunds: nondisclosure agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - Assembly - AB 1900 Weber Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1900 Weber (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Assembly - AB 1900 Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1900 Weber (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Assembly - AB 1900 Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 89, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-07-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-07-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.). |
2024-06-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4624.). |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2024-06-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-05-30 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4778.) |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar by request of Assembly Member Essayli. To Third Reading. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 2). |
2024-03-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-01-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 23. |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1748.50 | New Code | See Bill Text |