CA AB1841 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 4053 to the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to district agricultural associations.
Title
District agricultural associations: fiscal and compliance audits: ethics training.
Sponsors
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and E. & R. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 6. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 4053 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1841 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1841 |