CA AB1839 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-11 - Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 8 (commencing with Section 71440) to Division 34 of the Public Resources Code, relating to economic, environmental, and social recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic, environmental, and social recovery: California COVID-19 Recovery Deal.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2020-05-07AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2020-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2020-05-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2020-04-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2020-01-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
2020-01-06AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code71440New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback