CA AB1836 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-21 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-21 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3011 and 3017 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Vote by mail ballots.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Assembly | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 3011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 3017 | Amended Code | Citation Text |