CA AB182 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 53, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 53, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 19.6 (commencing with Section 32525) to Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code, relating to education finance, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
COVID-19 emergency response: Learning Recovery Emergency Fund: appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Assembly - AB 182 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB182 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 182 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB182 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 182 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 53, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-06-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-06-29 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 p.m. | |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4521.). |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2022-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2022-06-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 502.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 32525 | New Code | See Bill Text |