CA AB1807 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-10 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-10 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 21543, 21544, and 21545 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
County of Riverside Citizens Redistricting Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1807 Cervantes By Ashby (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 1807 Cervantes Assembly Third Reading By GARCIA (Y: 58 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 1807 Cervantes Assembly Third Reading By GARCIA (Y: 58 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2024-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8.). |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 15). |
2024-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and L. GOV. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 13.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and L. GOV. |
2024-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 21543 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 21544 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 21545 | Amended Code | Citation Text |