CA AB1777 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-17 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-17 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 38750 of, and to add Section 38751 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to autonomous vehicles.
Title
Autonomous vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 1777 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 1777 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-17 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2024-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) . |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 3. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 38750 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 38751 | New Code | See Bill Text |