CA AB1725 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5350.2, 5352, 5354, and 5360 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to conservatorships.
Title
Conservatorship hearings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 29). |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5350.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5352 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5354 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5360 | Amended Code | Citation Text |