CA AB1706 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-05 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-05 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 53395.8 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 96.1 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to infrastructure financing districts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Infrastructure financing districts: City and County of
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Asm. Fiona Ma [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1706 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 28 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1706 AMMIANO Motion to Reconsider (Y: 46 N: 26 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1706 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 30 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-16 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1706 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 28 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1706 AMMIANO Motion to Reconsider (Y: 46 N: 26 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1706 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 30 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-16 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-05 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-08-30 | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Page 5010.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-07-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 29). | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-06-01 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-01 | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 46. Noes 26. Page 5421.) Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 28. Page 5427.) | |
2010-04-22 | Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 38. Noes 30. Page 4816.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Ammiano. | |
2010-03-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-03-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (March 16). | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-02-02 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. | |
2010-02-01 | Read first time. To print. |