CA AB1696 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 417, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 417, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 201.6 of the Corporations Code, to amend Sections 396, 481, 663, 678, 678.1, 730, 1063.7, 1560.12, 1628, 1656, 1661, 1662, 1708, 1712.5, 1725, 4097.13, 10083, 10087, 10089.19, 10089.27, 10164.2, 10231.3, 10509.7, 11542.2, and 12340.6 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 1725.5 of, and to repeal and add Section 1682 of, the Insurance Code, to amend Section 1095 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, and to amend Section 4514 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance omnibus: developmental services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1696 Insurance Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1696 INS. (Daly) By Mendoza (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1696 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1696 INS. (Daly) By Mendoza (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1696 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 417, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3323.). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.) |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2771.). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1483.) |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1059.) |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2017-02-28 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |