CA AB1688 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 31910 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms.
Sponsors
Asm. Vince Fong [R] | Asm. Heath Flora [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Sen. Melissa Melendez [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Sen. Kelly Seyarto [R] | Asm. Thurston Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 24. |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 31910 | Amended Code | Citation Text |