CA AB1686 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 64.6 to the Harbors and Navigation Code, relating to waterways.
Title
Waterways: Lake Mathews.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Coms. on W., P. & W. and L. GOV. | |
2012-02-15 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | |
2012-02-14 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Harbors and Navigation Code | 64.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1686&sess=1112&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1651-1700/ab_1686_bill_20120214_introduced.html |