CA AB1686 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-05 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-05 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 40440.15 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.
Title
South coast district: diesel generators: communication
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-05 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. | |
2010-01-27 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. | |
2010-01-26 | Read first time. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1686&sess=0910&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1651-1700/ab_1686_bill_20100126_introduced.html |