CA AB1628 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 11 (commencing with Section 119425) to Part 15 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to environmental health.
Title
Microfiber filtration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1628 McKinnor Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1628 McKinnor et al. By Allen (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-28 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1628 McKinnor Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1628 McKinnor et al. By Allen (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-28 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1628 McKinnor Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2023-10-08 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 15. Page 3413.). |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 2646.). |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2023-08-28 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 12). |
2023-06-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 14. Page 2037.) |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1753.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18). |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 119425 | New Code | See Bill Text |