CA AB1607 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 27, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 27, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14169.53 and 14169.75 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Medi-Cal: hospitals: quality assurance fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - Assembly - AB 1607 BUDGET Concurrence- Urgency Added By TING (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1607 Committee On BUDGET (Ting) By Leno Urgency Clause (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1607 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1607 Committee On BUDGET (Ting) By Leno Urgency Clause (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1607 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 27, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5392.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5392.) Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5396.). |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 4377.). |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (June 13). |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 4573.) |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 4488.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14169.53 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14169.75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |