CA AB1585 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65582.1 of, and to add Section 65584.7 to, the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Planning and zoning: affordable housing: single application.
Sponsors
Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.) |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1005.) |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65582.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65584.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |