CA AB148 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 115, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 115, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2782.6 of the Civil Code, to add Section 5122.5 to the Corporations Code, to amend Sections 17210 and 17213 of the Education Code, to amend Sections 1348, 1350, 1352, 1745.1, and 1745.2 of the Fish and Game Code, to add Section 569.5 to the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Sections 8670.2, 8670.3, 8670.40, 15472, 15473, 15475, and 65850.2 of, to add Sections 15475.1, 15475.2, 15475.4, 15475.5, and 15475.6 to, and to add and repeal Section 16428.92 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 13143.9, 25501, 25503, 25504, 25506, 25507, 25507.1, 25510, 25510.1, 25516, 25517, 25531.2, 25532, 25533, 25534, 25534.05, 25534.06, 25534.5, 25535, 25535.1, 25535.2, 25535.5, 25536, 25536.6, 25536.9, 25537, 25537.5, 25538, 25539, 25541.5, 25542, 25543, 25543.1, 25543.2, 25543.3, and 25545 of, to add Section 41855.8 to, and to add and repeal Chapter 4.7 (commencing with Section 116773) of Part 12 of Division 104 of, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 7856 of the Labor Code, to amend Sections 5011, 8750, 14515.8, 14571.9, 14581, 21151.4, 21151.8, 25620.8, 25711.5, and 41821 of, and to add and repeal Section 5010.2.5 of, the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 270, 282, 895, 8385, 8386, 8386.1, 8386.3, 8386.5, and 8389 of the Public Utilities Code, to amend Sections 46001.5, 46007, 46008, 46011, 46017, 46021, 46023, 46028, 46053, 46101, 46151, and 46751 of, and to add Sections 46024 and 46025 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Section 81023 of, and to add and repeal Article 6 (commencing with Section 13198) of Chapter 3 of Division 7 of, the Water Code, relating to public resources, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-15 - Assembly - AB 148 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 58 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB148 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 148 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB148 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 148 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 115, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 2363.). |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2356.) |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2356.) |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1976.). |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 1962.) |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (July 14). |
2021-07-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1658.) |
2021-06-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1627.) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 485.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |