CA AB1355 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17704.08 of the Corporations Code, relating to limited liability companies.
Title
Limited liability companies: indemnification: agents.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & F. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 17704.08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |