CA AB1320 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 34187.1 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to redevelopment.
Title
Redevelopment: allocation of property tax: passthrough payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 34187 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34187.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |