CA AB1281 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 209, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 209, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1203.4, 1203.4a, 1203.4b, and 1203.425 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: protective orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1281 RUBIO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1281 Blanca Rubio et al. By Rubio (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1281 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1281 Blanca Rubio et al. By Rubio (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1281 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 209, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3082.). |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3063.) |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2581.). |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-07-05 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1533.) |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1203.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1203.425 | Amended Code | Citation Text |