CA AB128 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend the Budget Act of 2017 by amending Items 0250-001-3037, 0250-001-3066, 0845-001-0217, 1111-011-0001, 2660-302-0042, 2740-001-0044, 3360-001-0465, 3790-493, 4260-001-0001, 5225-002-0001, 6100-001-0890, 6100-105-0001, 6100-113-0001, 6100-113-0890, 6100-119-0890, 6100-134-0890, 6100-149-0001, 6100-156-0001, 6100-156-0890, 6100-194-0001, 6100-194-0890, 6100-197-0890, 6100-403, 6870-301-6087, 6870-403, and 9100-101-0001 of, and adding Item 6100-495 to, Section 2.00 of, and amending Sections 3.60, 31.00, and 39.00 of, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2017.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 128 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-20SenateRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2017-09-16SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
2017-08-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 22).
2017-08-21SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2017-05-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 25. Page 1607.)
2017-05-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-15AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2017-05-15AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2017-05-15AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1511.)
2017-01-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2017-01-11AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
2017-01-10AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback