CA AB118 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 631, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 631, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 116761.20 and 116761.23 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water.
Title
Safe Drinking Water State Revolving Fund.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Asm. Bonnie Lowenthal [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. Henry Perea [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Senate - Special Consent #10 AB118 Committee on E.S. & T.M.(Alejo) By Monning (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - AB 118 E.S.& T.M. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By ALEJO (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 118 E.S.& T.M. Assembly Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - AB 118 E.S.& T.M. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By ALEJO (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 118 E.S.& T.M. Assembly Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 631, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3326.). |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2403.). |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and HEALTH. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1661.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-03-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-01-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2013-01-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |