CA AB1175 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 588, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 588, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 486 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to cooperative agreements.
Title
Food and agriculture: cooperative agreements: agricultural inspector associates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1175 BOCANEGRA Concurrence in Senate Amendments By BOCANEGRA (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1175 Bocanegra By Lieu (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1175 BOCANEGRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1175 Bocanegra By Lieu (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1175 BOCANEGRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 588, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 6703.) In committee: Reconsideration granted. From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 29). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6717.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 6724.). |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Motion "Senate amendments be concurred in" failed passage. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 4724.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 19. Page 1597.) |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 15). |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 486 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22875.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22875.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |