CA AB1119 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 562, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 562, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 708.110 and 708.170 of, and to add section 708.111 to, the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Section 70617 of the Government Code, relating to civil actions.
Title
Enforcement of judgments.
Sponsors
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1119 Wicks Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1119 Wicks By Becker (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1119 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1119 Wicks Assembly Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 57 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1119 Wicks By Becker (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1119 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1119 Wicks Assembly Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 57 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 562, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-19 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3312.). |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3228.) |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2587.). |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-29 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 18. Page 2120.) |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 1934.) |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 26). |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 28). |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 708.110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 708.111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 708.170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 70617 | Amended Code | Citation Text |