CA AB1114 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 753, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 753, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65913.3 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Planning and zoning: housing development projects: postentitlement phase permits.
Sponsors
Asm. Matt Haney [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1114 Haney By Wiener (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1114 Haney Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1114 Haney Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 753, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2360.). |
2023-08-17 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-17 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1462.) |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 12). |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 22). |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65913.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |