AZ SJR1001 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation HJR2002

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Chapter 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Colorado river drought contingency plan

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colorado river drought contingency plan

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31SenateChapter 2
2019-01-31SenateGovernor Signed
2019-01-31SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-01-31SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-01-31HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2019-01-31HouseTransmit to House
2019-01-31SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0)
2019-01-31SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-01-30SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-01-30SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-01-30SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-01-30SenateSenate WAG Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2019-01-29SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate WAG Committee
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Same As/Similar To

HJR2002 (Replaces) 2019-01-31 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71777
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sjr1001p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sjr1001s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/sjr1001.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71777&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71777&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71777&billStatusActionId=185177&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71777&billStatusActionId=185179&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71777&billStatusActionId=185191&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback