AZ SCR1031 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public revenue expenditures; ballot measures
Title
Public revenue expenditures; ballot measures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-23 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-04-07 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-3-0) | |
2010-03-24 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2010-03-24 | House read second time | |
2010-03-23 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-23 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2010-03-23 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-08 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-08 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-01 | Senate Consent Calendar March 01, 2010 @ 2:33 PM | |
2010-03-02 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-27 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2010-01-27 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-26 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-26 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2010-01-26 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |