AZ SCR1025 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Colorado River Indian tribes library
Title
Colorado River Indian tribes library
Sponsors
Sen. Amanda Aguirre [D] | Sen. Jorge Garcia [D] | Rep. Albert Hale [D] | Rep. Russell Jones [R] |
Sen. Leah Landrum-Taylor [D] | Sen. Lynne Pancrazi [D] | Sen. Russell Pearce [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-04-06 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-06 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-29 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-16 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-03-03 | House read second time | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-02-15 | Transmit to House | |
2010-02-15 | Senate third reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-02-09 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-09 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-01 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-01-21 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |