AZ SCR1018 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - House APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - House APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Essential employees; pandemic
Title
Essential employees; pandemic
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-24 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-1-0) |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Aircraft License Tax
Concurrent Resolution
Constitution Of Arizona
Essential Employees
General Election
Pandemic
Technical Correction
Concurrent Resolution
Constitution Of Arizona
Essential Employees
General Election
Pandemic
Technical Correction
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 183 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 701.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 702 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 715 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 716 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 741 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 741.01 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 743 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 745 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 922 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 923 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |