AZ SCR1009 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-23 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-23 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax exemption; veterans; disabilities
Title
Property tax exemption; veterans; disabilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-06-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-3-2-0) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-12-22 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Amendment
Applicability (h)
Concurrent Resolution
Constitution Of Arizona
Constitutional Amendments (arizona) (h)
Disabilities
General Election
Honorable
Permanent Mental Disability
Permanent Physical Disability
Property Tax Exemption
Property Tax Exemptions (h)
Spouse
Uniformed Services
Veterans
Applicability (h)
Concurrent Resolution
Constitution Of Arizona
Constitutional Amendments (arizona) (h)
Disabilities
General Election
Honorable
Permanent Mental Disability
Permanent Physical Disability
Property Tax Exemption
Property Tax Exemptions (h)
Spouse
Uniformed Services
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 215 | New Code | See Bill Text |