AZ SCR1009 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Hopi code talkers
Title
Honoring Hopi code talkers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Transmitted to Secretary Of State | |
2011-04-12 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-12 | House third reading , voting: (59-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-21 | House Consent Calendar March 21, 2011 @ 3:30 PM | |
2011-03-22 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-22 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-21 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-4-0) | |
2011-02-21 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-02 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2011-02-22 | House read second time | |
2011-02-21 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-02-02 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-02 | Senate third reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2011-01-26 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | |
2011-01-25 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-01-25 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-01-24 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Senate VMA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-12 | Referred to Senate VMA Committee | |
2011-01-12 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-11 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-11 | Assigned to Senate VMA Committee | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |