AZ SCR1004 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-2-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-2-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supplemental benefits; eligible persons
Title
Supplemental benefits; eligible persons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-2-0) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate TPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-1-0) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TPS Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Concurrent Resolution
Eligible Persons
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Referendum
Supplemental Benefits
Eligible Persons
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Referendum
Supplemental Benefits