AZ SCM1015 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

EPA; exceeding authority; urging Congress

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EPA; exceeding authority; urging Congress

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-30 Transmitted to Secretary Of State
2016-03-30HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-03-30HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (33-24-3-0)
2016-03-15HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-15HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-14HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2016-03-02HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-03-09HouseHouse FSR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-3-0)
2016-03-03HouseReferred to House FSR Committee
2016-03-03HouseHouse read second time
2016-03-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-03-02HouseAssigned to House FSR Committee
2016-03-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2016-02-18SenateTransmit to House
2016-02-18SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (19-10-1-0)
2016-02-16SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-16SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-15SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2016-02-01SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-09SenateSenate FMFR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0)
2016-02-02SenateReferred to Senate FMFR Committee
2016-02-02SenateSenate read second time
2016-02-01SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-01SenateAssigned to Senate FMFR Committee
2016-02-01SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback