AZ SB1840 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by HB2906
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-30 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-30 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Governance; audits; training.
Title
Governance; audits; training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Motion Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1840 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Motion Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1840 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-06-30 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-06-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1840 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2906 (Replaced by) 2021-07-09 - Chapter 427
Subjects
Audit Results
Audits
Budget
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Community College District Board Of Directors
Community College District Boards (h)
Community College Districts
Community Colleges (h)
Counties - Title 11
Education - Title 15
Ethnicity Information
Governance
Government Audits
Local Governments
Practices
Public Meetings
Race
Sex
State And Local Government Practices
State Government - Title 41
Training
Audits
Budget
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Community College District Board Of Directors
Community College District Boards (h)
Community College Districts
Community Colleges (h)
Counties - Title 11
Education - Title 15
Ethnicity Information
Governance
Government Audits
Local Governments
Practices
Public Meetings
Race
Sex
State And Local Government Practices
State Government - Title 41
Training
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 661 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1473 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 481 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |