AZ HB2906 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1840
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chapter 427
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chapter 427
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Governance; audits; training
Title
Governance; audits; training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Motion Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing House Bill 2906 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - Motion Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2906 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Motion Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing House Bill 2906 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - Motion Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2906 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Senate | Chapter 427 |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing House Bill 2906 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-06-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-25-4-0) |
2021-06-25 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2906 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading |
2021-06-15 | House | House read second time |
2021-06-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1840 (Replaces) 2021-06-30 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Subjects
Audit Results
Audits
Budget
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Community Colleges
Counties - Title 11
Education - Title 15
Ethnicity Information
Governance
Government Audits
Local Governments
Practices
Public Meetings
Race
Sex
State And Local Government Practices
State Government - Title 41
Training
Audits
Budget
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Community Colleges
Counties - Title 11
Education - Title 15
Ethnicity Information
Governance
Government Audits
Local Governments
Practices
Public Meetings
Race
Sex
State And Local Government Practices
State Government - Title 41
Training
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 661 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1473 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 481 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |