AZ SB1725 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2815
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Chapter 138
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Chapter 138
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environment; 2023-2024.
Title
Environment; 2023-2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | Chapter 138 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-05-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (47-12-0-0) |
2023-05-10 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-8-0-0) |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0) |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2815 (Replaces) 2023-05-10 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Subjects
2023-2024
Adeq (see Also: Department Of Environmental Quality)
Agricultural Fees
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation Limit
Arizona Water Banking Fund
Arizona Water Protection Fund
Budget Bills
Continuation
Delayed Repeal
Department Of Environmental Quality (adeq)
Environment
Exemption From Rulemaking
Fire Incident Management Fund
Fiscal Year 2023-2024
Hazard Mitigation Revolving Fund
Intent
Military Affairs And Emergency Management - Title 26
Underground Storage Tank Revolving Fund
Use Of Monies
Vehicle Emissions Testing Fees
Water Quality Assurance Revolving Fund (wqarf)
Wqarf (see Also: Water Quality Assurance Revolving Fund)
Adeq (see Also: Department Of Environmental Quality)
Agricultural Fees
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation Limit
Arizona Water Banking Fund
Arizona Water Protection Fund
Budget Bills
Continuation
Delayed Repeal
Department Of Environmental Quality (adeq)
Environment
Exemption From Rulemaking
Fire Incident Management Fund
Fiscal Year 2023-2024
Hazard Mitigation Revolving Fund
Intent
Military Affairs And Emergency Management - Title 26
Underground Storage Tank Revolving Fund
Use Of Monies
Vehicle Emissions Testing Fees
Water Quality Assurance Revolving Fund (wqarf)
Wqarf (see Also: Water Quality Assurance Revolving Fund)