AZ SB1685 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - House read second time
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - House read second time
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; attendance boundaries; open enrollment
Title
Schools; attendance boundaries; open enrollment
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Boyer [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Sen. Rick Gray [R] | Sen. Thomas Shope [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Attendance Boundaries
Capacity
Definitions
Education - Title 15
Enrollment
Equitable Selection Process
Open Enrollment
Reporting Requirements
Resident Pupil
School Attendance
Schools
Selection Process
Standard Format
State Board Of Education
Transportation
Attendance Boundaries
Capacity
Definitions
Education - Title 15
Enrollment
Equitable Selection Process
Open Enrollment
Reporting Requirements
Resident Pupil
School Attendance
Schools
Selection Process
Standard Format
State Board Of Education
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 816 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 816.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |