AZ SB1679 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Chapter 245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Chapter 245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mixed martial arts; boxing; gaming
Title
Mixed martial arts; boxing; gaming
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Janae Shamp [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-21 | Senate | Chapter 245 |
2024-06-21 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (21-5-4-0) |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-04-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (52-8-0-0) |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2024-03-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-22 | House | House TI Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0) |
2024-03-12 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-04 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate TTMC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TTMC Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Additional Fees
Amusements And Sports - Title 5 (h)
Boxing (h)
Court Diversion Fee
Defensive Driving Schools
Disposition
Effective Date
Fees
Gaming (h)
Heading Change (h)
Mixed Martial Arts (h)
Transportation - Title 28
Vendors
Amusements And Sports - Title 5 (h)
Boxing (h)
Court Diversion Fee
Defensive Driving Schools
Disposition
Effective Date
Fees
Gaming (h)
Heading Change (h)
Mixed Martial Arts (h)
Transportation - Title 28
Vendors
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 223 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 224 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 228 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 230 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 233 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 235.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 236 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 237 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 238 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |