AZ SB1677 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Firefighters; peace officers; PTSD; therapy
Title
Firefighters; peace officers; PTSD; therapy
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Janae Shamp [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Motion Motion by Representative Biasiucci that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), SB1677 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Motion Motion by Representative Biasiucci that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), SB1677 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-04-03 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2024-03-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-19 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-18 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2024-03-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-03-18 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (15-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-14 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-7-3-0) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-1-0) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate FICO Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FICO Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Annual Report
Certified Peace Officers
Conditional Enactment
Counseling
Coverage
Definitions
Firefighters
Industrial Commission Of Arizona
Labor - Title 23
Notice
Peace Officers
Post-traumatic Stress Disorder
Ptsd
Report
Therapy
Traumatic Event
Workers' Compensation
Certified Peace Officers
Conditional Enactment
Counseling
Coverage
Definitions
Firefighters
Industrial Commission Of Arizona
Labor - Title 23
Notice
Peace Officers
Post-traumatic Stress Disorder
Ptsd
Report
Therapy
Traumatic Event
Workers' Compensation