AZ SB1672 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (16-0-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (16-0-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Military affairs commission; membership; appropriation
Title
Military affairs commission; membership; appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (16-0-0-1-0-0) |
2024-03-18 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-3-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-03-06 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-4-0-0) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-1-0) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Application Review
Appropriation
Appropriations
Award Of Monies
Confidential Discussions
Confidential Information
Definition
Definitions
Exemption
Membership
Military Affairs And Emergency Management - Title 26
Military Affairs Commission
Military Installation Fund
Purposes
Reporting Requirements
Retention Of Members
Rules
Use Of Monies
Appropriation
Appropriations
Award Of Monies
Confidential Discussions
Confidential Information
Definition
Definitions
Exemption
Membership
Military Affairs And Emergency Management - Title 26
Military Affairs Commission
Military Installation Fund
Purposes
Reporting Requirements
Retention Of Members
Rules
Use Of Monies
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
26 | 262 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
26 | 263 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |