AZ SB1639 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Subsequent felony; sealing case records
Title
Subsequent felony; sealing case records
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Carroll [R] | Sen. Shawnna Bolick [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Jake Hoffman [R] |
Sen. Warren Petersen [R] | Sen. Janae Shamp [R] | Rep. Michael Carbone [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Motion Motion by Representative Biasiucci that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), SB1639 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Motion Motion by Representative Biasiucci that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), SB1639 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-04-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-1-0) |
2024-04-03 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-04-03 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2024-03-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-25 | House | House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (17-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-19 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-18 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2024-03-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-03-05 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-10-5-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FICO Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate FICO Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0) |
Subjects
Currency
Delayed Repeal
Duties
Establishing
Gold
Gold And Silver Currency Study Committee
Membership
Report
Silver
Study Committee
Delayed Repeal
Duties
Establishing
Gold
Gold And Silver Currency Study Committee
Membership
Report
Silver
Study Committee