AZ SB1568 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health professionals; complaints; investigations
Title
Health professionals; complaints; investigations
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-17 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-16 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-03-15 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-1-0) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Complainant Confidentiality
Complaints
Exceptions
Health Profession Regulatory Boards
Health Professionals
Investigations
Notice
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Complaints
Exceptions
Health Profession Regulatory Boards
Health Professionals
Investigations
Notice
Professions And Occupations - Title 32