AZ SB1555 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - House read second time
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - House read second time
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Breastfeeding mothers; teachers; accommodation
Title
Breastfeeding mothers; teachers; accommodation
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Bennett [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-03-06 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-2-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Accommodations
Breastfeeding Mothers
Charter Schools (h)
Employment
Exemption
Infant
Labor - Title 23
Nursing Mother
Public Schools
Reasonable Accommodation
Teachers
Breastfeeding Mothers
Charter Schools (h)
Employment
Exemption
Infant
Labor - Title 23
Nursing Mother
Public Schools
Reasonable Accommodation
Teachers