AZ SB1533 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Chapter 261
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Chapter 261
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special plates; Alzheimer's; child abuse
Title
Special plates; Alzheimer's; child abuse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-27 | Senate | Chapter 261 |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (27-2-1-0) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-6-0-0) |
2019-05-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-04-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-27 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-19 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-03-14 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate TPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TPS Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Alzheimer's
Child Abuse
Conditional Enactment
Effective Date
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Special License Plates
Special Plates
Transportation - Title 28
Child Abuse
Conditional Enactment
Effective Date
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Special License Plates
Special Plates
Transportation - Title 28
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2463 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6993 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 123.02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |