AZ SB1518 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-13 - House motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-13 - House motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Ballots; election day; identification
Title
Ballots; election day; identification
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Bennett [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-13 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2023-06-13 | House | House final reading FAILED, voting: (24-32-4-0) |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (17-11-2-0) |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate Conference adopted |
2023-06-13 | House | House Conference adopted |
2023-06-13 | House | House Conference caucus date |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate Conference caucus date |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate Minority report |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate Conference report: That the bill be accepted as originally passed by the Senate and be further amended. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2023-06-12 | House | House Conference members: BIASIUCCI, DE LOS SANTOS, TOMA |
2023-06-12 | House | House Conference appointed |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Senate Conference members: BENNETT, MENDEZ, MESNARD |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Senate Conference appointed |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-05-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (37-21-1-0) |
2023-04-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-04-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2023-04-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-04-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-04-04 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-04-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-29 | House | House read second time |
2023-03-29 | House | House MOE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Assigned to House MOE Committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-03-22 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Ballot (h)
Ballot Abuse
Ballots
Challenges
Classification
Cure Period
Early Voting
Election Day
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Identification
Laws 2022
Transmission Of Ballot
Violation
Ballot Abuse
Ballots
Challenges
Classification
Cure Period
Early Voting
Election Day
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Identification
Laws 2022
Transmission Of Ballot
Violation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 407.04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 550 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 572 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 579 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 673 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |