AZ SB1515 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-22 - Senate RULES Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (2-5-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-22 - Senate RULES Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (2-5-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amusement gambling; definition; money
Title
Amusement gambling; definition; money
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Driggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (2-5-0-0) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |