AZ SB1508 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Senate TPS Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-4-0-0)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Senate TPS Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-4-0-0)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement officers; additional benefits
Title
Law enforcement officers; additional benefits
Sponsors
Rep. David Livingston [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Rep. Kevin Payne [R] |
Rep. Bret Roberts [R] | Rep. Michelle Udall [R] | Rep. Jeff Weninger [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate TPS Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-4-0-0) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TPS Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Additional Benefits
Applicability
Benefits
Death Benefits
Definitions
Health Insurance
Killed In Line Of Duty
Labor - Title 23
Law Enforcement Officers
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Survivor Benefits
Applicability
Benefits
Death Benefits
Definitions
Health Insurance
Killed In Line Of Duty
Labor - Title 23
Law Enforcement Officers
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Survivor Benefits
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 1046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 1114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 846 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 904 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |