AZ SB1489 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-15-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-15-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; rate adjustment
Title
Individual income tax; rate adjustment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-15-0-0) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-1-0) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Adjustment
Applicability
Individual Income Tax
Jlbc
Rates
State General Fund
State Government - Title 41
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Applicability
Individual Income Tax
Jlbc
Rates
State General Fund
State Government - Title 41
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 1275 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |